WA SB5931 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-08 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-08 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding mental health counselor privilege.
Title
Regarding mental health counselor privilege.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-08 | Chapter 424, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-08 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-23 | President signed. | |
2009-04-21 | Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 1; absent, 2; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-21 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-07 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-25 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-11 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-24 | JUD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-20 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-09 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |