WA SB5929 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the membership of the legislative-executive WorkFirst poverty reduction oversight task force.
Title
Changing the membership of the legislative-executive WorkFirst poverty reduction oversight task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Chapter 176, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 31; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2022-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-22 | House | HHSV - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 08a | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 08a | 510 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |