WA SB5928 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Effective date 6/28/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-18SenateEffective date 6/28/2016.
2016-04-18SenateChapter 33, 2016 Laws 1st Special Session.
2016-04-18SenateGovernor signed.
2016-03-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2016-03-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2016-03-29SenatePresident signed.
2016-03-29HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2016-03-29HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2016-03-29HouseRead first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
2016-03-29SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2016-03-29SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2016-03-29Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2016-03-29SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2016-03-10SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-03-04SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2016-03-03SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2016-03-03SenateMinority; do not pass.
2016-03-03SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2016-03-03SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2016-01-11SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-06-28SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-05-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-02-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback