WA SB5915 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning central service functions, powers, and duties of state government.
Title
Concerning central service functions, powers, and duties of state government.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-13 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:00 PM. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |