WA SB5914 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a waiver request to implement a premium assistance program to purchase market-based insurance for medicaid-eligible individuals.
Title
Concerning a waiver request to implement a premium assistance program to purchase market-based insurance for medicaid-eligible individuals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |