WA SB5912 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning insurance coverage of tomosynthesis or three-dimensional mammography.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning insurance coverage of tomosynthesis or three-dimensional mammography.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenateEffective date 6/7/2018.
2018-03-21SenateChapter 115, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-21SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-05SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-01SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-02-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-21HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-20HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-16HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-16HouseHCW - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-16HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-01HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness
2018-01-31SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2018-01-31SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-31SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-31SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-29SenateWM - Majority; without recommendation.
2018-01-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-26SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-01-25SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-25SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-01-25SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2018-01-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-08SenateDue to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-03-29SenateFirst reading, referred to Health Care.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback