WA SB5911 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing hazard pay retention bonuses to certain health care employees.
Title
Providing hazard pay retention bonuses to certain health care employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |