WA SB5906 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a regional transit authority rebate program for low-income individuals.
Title
Establishing a regional transit authority rebate program for low-income individuals.
Sponsors
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2148 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5906&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5906.pdf |