WA SB5900 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a provisional paramedic or emergency medical technician license.
Title
Creating a provisional paramedic or emergency medical technician license.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-23 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 71 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
18 | 71 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 73 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |