WA SB5896 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning claims against public entities.
Title
Concerning claims against public entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |