WA SB5889 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the customer voice council.
Title
Establishing the customer voice council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | HS - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services. |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1988 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-19 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services, Youth, & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.