WA SB5887 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning health carrier requirements for prior authorization standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning health carrier requirements for prior authorization standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21HouseHCW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:30 AM.
2020-02-12HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-17HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2020-01-15SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-01-15SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-01-15SenateFloor amendment
2020-01-15SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2020-01-13SenatePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-28SenateReturned to Senate Rules 3.
2019-04-24HouseHouse insists on its position and asks Senate to concur.
2019-04-18SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-12HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-12HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-02HouseHCW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-27HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 9:00 AM.
2019-03-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2019-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-06Senate1st substitute bill not substituted.
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-21SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-19SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-19SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 5:30 PM.
2019-02-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5887&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5887.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5887-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5887.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5887.E2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119420&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5887&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119420&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5887&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119420&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=01-15-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5887&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback