WA SB5887 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the medical use of cannabis.
Title
Concerning the medical use of cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-11 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2014-03-11 | House | First Reading. |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-03-08 | Senate | 3rd substitute bill substituted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | CL - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | And refer to Commerce & Labor. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | And refer to Health Care. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |