WA SB5886 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sale of certain department of transportation surplus property.
Title
Concerning the sale of certain department of transportation surplus property.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Tracey Eide [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |