WA SB5883 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/2017*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/2017*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to fiscal matters.
Title
Relating to fiscal matters.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Effective date 6/30/2017*. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 1, 2017 Laws 3rd Special Session PV. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-30 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2017-06-30 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 8:00 AM. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |