WA SB5880 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning fire protection sprinkler system contractors.
Title
Concerning fire protection sprinkler system contractors.
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-17 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | BFST - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 160 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
18 | 160 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 160 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 160 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 160 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 160 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 270 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 270 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 270 | 900 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |