WA SB5874 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning residency of students affiliated with the military.
Title
Concerning residency of students affiliated with the military.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by College & Workforce Development (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education & Workforce Development (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by College & Workforce Development (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education & Workforce Development (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 249, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2022-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee amendment |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2022-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2022-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-23 | House | CWD - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |