WA SB5871 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Columbia river recreational salmon and steelhead endorsement program.
Title
Concerning the Columbia river recreational salmon and steelhead endorsement program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5871&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5871.pdf |