WA SB5869 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning photographs, digital photographs, microphotographs, videotapes, other recorded images, or other records identifying a specific instance of travel from toll systems and traffic safety cameras.
Title
Concerning photographs, digital photographs, microphotographs, videotapes, other recorded images, or other records identifying a specific instance of travel from toll systems and traffic safety cameras.
Sponsors
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 63 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 63 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |