WA SB5867 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resentencing of persons convicted of drug offenses.
Title
Resentencing of persons convicted of drug offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Sen. Douglas Ericksen [R] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 55, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |