WA SB5855 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of campaign funds to reimburse expenses for child care and other caregiving services.
Title
Concerning the use of campaign funds to reimburse expenses for child care and other caregiving services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Chapter 174, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2022-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-02 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-23 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |