WA SB5854 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ethical performance of faculty duties.
Title
Concerning ethical performance of faculty duties.
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-21 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Chapter 173, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-21 | House | CWD - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to State Government & Elections. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | And refer to State Government & Elections. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 52 | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 52 | 200 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 52 | 220 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 52 | 360 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |