WA SB5848 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governor to enter into agreements with federally recognized Indian tribes in the state of Washington concerning marijuana.
Title
Authorizing the governor to enter into agreements with federally recognized Indian tribes in the state of Washington concerning marijuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 5:30 PM. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2000 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-08 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5848&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5848.pdf |