WA SB5847 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Facilitating transportation projects of statewide significance.
Title
Facilitating transportation projects of statewide significance.
Sponsors
Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1994 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.