WA SB5845 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sexual harassment policies, training, and reporting requirements throughout state government.
Title
Concerning sexual harassment policies, training, and reporting requirements throughout state government.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5845&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5845.pdf |