WA SB5843 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making it unlawful for public officials and candidates to knowingly make false statements and claims regarding the election process or results of elections conducted within the state.
Title
Making it unlawful for public officials and candidates to knowingly make false statements and claims regarding the election process or results of elections conducted within the state.
Sponsors
Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | SGE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29a | 84 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 12 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |