WA SB5843 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the rights of clients of the developmental disabilities administration of the department of social and health services.
Title
Concerning the rights of clients of the developmental disabilities administration of the department of social and health services.
Sponsors
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1651 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5843&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5843.pdf |