WA SB5839 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-11 - Referred to Health & Long Term Care.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-11 - Referred to Health & Long Term Care.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a tax preference for prescription drug warehousing firms to invest in rural and high-need area opioid use disorder treatment and support infrastructures.
Title
Repealing a tax preference for prescription drug warehousing firms to invest in rural and high-need area opioid use disorder treatment and support infrastructures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | And refer to Health & Long Term Care. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | HSC - Majority; without recommendation. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5839&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5839.pdf |