WA SB5828 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the medicaid home health reimbursement rate for medical assistance clients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the medicaid home health reimbursement rate for medical assistance clients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.
2019-03-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-28SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-13SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-05SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback