WA SB5825 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 6/30/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 6/30/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the tolling of Interstate 405, state route number 167, and state route number 509.
Title
Addressing the tolling of Interstate 405, state route number 167, and state route number 509.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Effective date 6/30/2019. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 421, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 32; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-27 | House | Held on third reading. |
2019-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-27 | House | Committee amendment |
2019-04-27 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-27 | House | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-27 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:30 AM. |
2019-04-26 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1899 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.