WA SB5822 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Providing a pathway to establish a universal health care system for the residents of Washington state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a pathway to establish a universal health care system for the residents of Washington state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-04-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-02HouseHCW - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-27HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2019-03-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-13Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-09SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-28SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-19SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-19SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-19SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 5:30 PM.
2019-02-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-04SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Same As/Similar To

HB1877 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-04 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback