WA SB5819 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a postconviction review board and review process for early release of qualifying offenders.
Title
Establishing a postconviction review board and review process for early release of qualifying offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | On motion, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Held at the Desk. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading. |