WA SB5819 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the definition of legislative authority for purposes of local tourism promotion areas.
Title
Modifying the definition of legislative authority for purposes of local tourism promotion areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | TRED - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1279 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-28 - Effective date 7/24/2015.