WA SB5817 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning senior students in accredited schools of chiropractic.
Title
Concerning senior students in accredited schools of chiropractic.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] |
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 405, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-27 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 5:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1477 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.