WA SB5801 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning attorney and witness fees in industrial insurance court appeals.
Title
Concerning attorney and witness fees in industrial insurance court appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-22 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |