WA SB5793 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-25 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-25 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing credit towards child support obligations for veterans benefits.
Title
Providing credit towards child support obligations for veterans benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-25 | Senate | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-04-25 | Senate | Chapter 124, 2015 Laws. |
2015-04-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-01 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-11 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 6:00 PM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1260 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.