WA SB5788 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning guardianship of minors.
Title
Concerning guardianship of minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022*. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 243, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2022-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee amendment |
2022-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-23 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 130 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 130 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 130 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 130 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 130 | 225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 04 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 12 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 23 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |