WA SB5786 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a business and occupation tax exemption for certain sales of commercial fertilizer, agricultural crop protection products, and seed.
Title
Creating a business and occupation tax exemption for certain sales of commercial fertilizer, agricultural crop protection products, and seed.
Sponsors
Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | AWTE - Majority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1916 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5786&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5786.pdf |