WA SB5778 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the current backlog of vehicle inspections.
Title
Addressing the current backlog of vehicle inspections.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] |
Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-03-05 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-03-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |