WA SB5776 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the criminal justice integrated data system and a violence and death investigation resource center.
Title
Creating the criminal justice integrated data system and a violence and death investigation resource center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
42 | 56 | 240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 103 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 70 | New Code | See Bill Text |