WA SB5771 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing investigations under the ethics act.
Title
Addressing investigations under the ethics act.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Kirk Pearson [R] | Sen. Brian Dansel [R] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] |
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:45 PM. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | GOS - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Security. |