WA SB5768 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing the regulation of vapor products.
Title
Enhancing the regulation of vapor products.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. June Robinson [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2039 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-18 - First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 345 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 345 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 345 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |