WA SB5766 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Improving relationships between agricultural producers and state regulatory staff.
Title
Improving relationships between agricultural producers and state regulatory staff.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
Rep. Lisa Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | AWRD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development. |