WA SB5763 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating subprevailing wage certificates for individuals with disabilities.
Title
Eliminating subprevailing wage certificates for individuals with disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Chapter 55, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2022-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-18 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |