WA SB5762 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the purple star award.
Title
Creating the purple star award.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-24 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |