WA SB5758 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing college and career readiness and graduation rates in public schools.
Title
Increasing college and career readiness and graduation rates in public schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] |
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2075 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.