WA SB5755 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing and mitigating the impacts of property crimes in Washington state.
Title
Addressing and mitigating the impacts of property crimes in Washington state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Placed on third reading. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 9:00 AM. |
2015-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:45 PM. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 6:00 PM. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1885 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.