WA SB5754 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the publication of tax data to ensure the transparency of Washington's tax preferences.
Title
Concerning the publication of tax data to ensure the transparency of Washington's tax preferences.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
Sen. Phillips Rockefeller [D] | Sen. Scott White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-09 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5754&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5754.pdf |