WA SB5752 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Washington future fund trust fund program.
Title
Creating the Washington future fund trust fund program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1861 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
43 | 79a | 040 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |