WA SB5748 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bringing Washington state government contracting provisions into compliance with federal law as it relates to small works bonding requirements.
Title
Bringing Washington state government contracting provisions into compliance with federal law as it relates to small works bonding requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5748&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5748.pdf |